NY S06799 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on October 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-10-03 - SIGNED CHAP.487
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Directs the commissioner of motor vehicles to provide a space on the forms of identification cards and licenses for a notation for veterans of the United States armed forces.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Directs the commissioner of motor vehicles to provide a space on the forms of identification cards and licenses for a notation for veterans of the United States armed forces.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-10-03AssemblySIGNED CHAP.487
2012-09-21SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2012-06-20Assemblyreturned to senate
2012-06-20Assemblypassed assembly
2012-06-20Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.517
2012-06-20Assemblysubstituted for a9611
2012-06-06Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2012-06-06SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2012-06-06SenatePASSED SENATE
2012-05-30SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2012-05-23Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2012-05-22Senate1ST REPORT CAL.896
2012-03-22SenateREFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS

Same As/Similar To

A09611 (Same As) 2012-06-20 - substituted by s6799

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback