NY A09611 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-5)
Status: Introduced on March 20 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-20 - substituted by s6799
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 20 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-20 - substituted by s6799
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the commissioner of motor vehicles to provide a space on the forms of identification cards and licenses for a notation for veterans of the United States armed forces.
Title
Directs the commissioner of motor vehicles to provide a space on the forms of identification cards and licenses for a notation for veterans of the United States armed forces.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-20 | Assembly | substituted by s6799 |
2012-06-20 | Assembly | rules report cal.517 |
2012-06-20 | Assembly | reported |
2012-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2012-04-18 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2012-03-20 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S06799 (Same As) 2012-10-03 - SIGNED CHAP.487