NY S06798 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 14-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-05 - referred to education
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires a police officer to be present at schools within the city of New York during instructional hours and at least one hour prior and one hour after such instructional hours.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires a police officer to be present at schools within the city of New York during instructional hours and at least one hour prior and one hour after such instructional hours.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 51 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-05Assemblyreferred to education
2018-03-05SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-03-05SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-03-05SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.546
2018-03-05SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2018-02-02SenatePRINT NUMBER 6798A
2018-02-02SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CITIES
2018-01-03SenateREFERRED TO CITIES
2018-01-03Assemblyreturned to senate
2018-01-03Assemblydied in assembly
2017-06-21Assemblyreferred to education
2017-06-21SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2017-06-21SenatePASSED SENATE
2017-06-21SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.2200
2017-06-18SenateREFERRED TO RULES

Same As/Similar To

A09975 (Same As) 2018-06-06 - held for consideration in education

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback