NY S06785 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-30 - VETOED MEMO.6730
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on July 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-30 - VETOED MEMO.6730
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for the continuation of health insurance benefits for public employees injured or taken ill in the performance of duty.
Title
Provides for the continuation of health insurance benefits for public employees injured or taken ill in the performance of duty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 113 N: 21 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-16 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-16 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-30 | VETOED MEMO.6730 | |
2010-07-19 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | |
2010-06-30 | returned to senate | |
2010-06-30 | passed assembly | |
2010-06-30 | ordered to third reading rules cal.485 | |
2010-06-30 | substituted for a9943 | |
2010-06-16 | referred to ways and means | |
2010-06-16 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2010-06-16 | PASSED SENATE | |
2010-06-16 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1016 | |
2010-06-15 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | |
2010-04-13 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE | |
2010-02-05 | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A9943 (Same As) 2010-06-30 - substituted by s6785