NY S06776 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-28 - referred to corporations, authorities and commissions
Pending: Assembly Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-28 - referred to corporations, authorities and commissions
Pending: Assembly Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires certain reports of public authorities are published via the public authorities reporting information system and shall not require login credentials.
Title
Requires certain reports of public authorities are published via the public authorities reporting information system and shall not require login credentials.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-28 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-05-07 - Senate - Senate Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-05-16 - Senate - Senate Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-07 - Senate - Senate Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-05-16 - Senate - Senate Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-28 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2024-05-28 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-05-28 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2024-05-13 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-05-08 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-05-07 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.954 |
2024-04-30 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6776A |
2024-04-30 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2023-06-01 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2023-06-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-06-01 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-05-18 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2023-05-17 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2023-05-16 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.995 |
2023-05-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A09477 (Same As) 2024-05-02 - print number 9477a