NY S06774 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-13 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9552A
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-13 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9552A
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits persons from owning, possessing, selling, transferring or manufacturing animal fighting paraphernalia with intent to engage in animal fighting.
Title
Prohibits persons from owning, possessing, selling, transferring or manufacturing animal fighting paraphernalia with intent to engage in animal fighting.
Sponsors
Sen. Patricia Ritchie [R] | Sen. Tony Avella [D] | Sen. John Bonacic [R] | Sen. Neil Breslin [D] |
Sen. Martin Dilan [D] | Sen. Liz Krueger [D] | Sen. Toby Stavisky [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-04-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-13 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A9552A |
2012-05-30 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 6774A |
2012-05-30 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2012-05-30 | Senate | returned to senate |
2012-05-30 | Assembly | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY |
2012-04-19 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2012-04-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-04-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-03-29 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2012-03-28 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2012-03-27 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.457 |
2012-03-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE |
Same As/Similar To
A09552 (Same As) 2012-07-18 - signed chap.144