NY S06773 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-02 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Increases the amount of the farm workforce retention credit from $600 to $1,200 per farm employee.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Increases the amount of the farm workforce retention credit from $600 to $1,200 per farm employee.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-02Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2020-03-02SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2020-03-02SenatePASSED SENATE
2020-02-27SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2020-02-26Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2020-02-25Senate1ST REPORT CAL.480
2020-01-28SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
2020-01-08SenateREFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
2019-10-11SenateREFERRED TO RULES

Same As/Similar To

A08760 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to ways and means

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback