NY S06766 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to contracts for the transportation of school children.
Title
Relates to contracts for the transportation of school children.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-06-22 | Assembly | referred to education |
2017-06-21 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-21 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-21 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.2227 |
2017-06-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |