NY S06740 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-01 - SIGNED CHAP.362
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-01 - SIGNED CHAP.362
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to a health insurance demonstration program for early retirees.
Title
Relates to a health insurance demonstration program for early retirees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-01 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.362 |
2012-07-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2012-06-14 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2012-06-14 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2012-06-14 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.496 |
2012-06-14 | Assembly | substituted for a9675b |
2012-06-13 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
2012-06-13 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-06-13 | Senate | REPASSED SENATE |
2012-06-04 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 6740B |
2012-05-21 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 6740A |
2012-05-21 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2012-05-21 | Senate | returned to senate |
2012-05-21 | Assembly | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY |
2012-05-08 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
2012-05-08 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-05-08 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-04-30 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2012-04-26 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2012-04-25 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.568 |
2012-03-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A09675 (Same As) 2012-06-14 - substituted by s6740b