NY S06715 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 5 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-05 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9578
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 5 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-05 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9578
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Designates all that portion of the state highway system constituting New York state route 109 bridge over the southern state parkway in the town of Babylon, Suffolk county, as the "Lieutenant Commander Phillip Wayne Johnson Memorial Bridge".
Title
Designates all that portion of the state highway system constituting New York state route 109 bridge over the southern state parkway in the town of Babylon, Suffolk county, as the "Lieutenant Commander Phillip Wayne Johnson Memorial Bridge".
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-05 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A9578 |
2024-05-23 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-05-22 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-05-21 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1360 |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2023-12-20 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6715B |
2023-12-20 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO RULES |
2023-06-10 | Senate | RECOMMITTED TO RULES |
2023-06-07 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1695 |
2023-06-07 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2023-06-05 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6715A |
2023-06-05 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION |
2023-05-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A09578 (Same As) 2024-06-05 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY