NY S06715 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-18 - SIGNED CHAP.228
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-18 - SIGNED CHAP.228
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to roundabouts and makes technical corrections to provisions of law relating to lane-use control signal indications, circular intersections and railroad grade crossings.
Title
Relates to roundabouts and makes technical corrections to provisions of law relating to lane-use control signal indications, circular intersections and railroad grade crossings.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-18 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.228 |
2012-07-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2012-06-19 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2012-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2012-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.365 |
2012-06-19 | Assembly | substituted for a10298 |
2012-03-27 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2012-03-27 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-03-27 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-03-22 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2012-03-21 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2012-03-20 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.409 |
2012-03-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A10298 (Same As) 2012-06-19 - substituted by s6715