NY S06693 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-17 - referred to insurance
Pending: Assembly Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-17 - referred to insurance
Pending: Assembly Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to mortgage guaranty insurance; removes requirement that mortgage guaranty insurers restrict their coverage, net of applicable reinsurance, to twenty-five percent of the total indebtedness to an insured.
Title
Relates to mortgage guaranty insurance; removes requirement that mortgage guaranty insurers restrict their coverage, net of applicable reinsurance, to twenty-five percent of the total indebtedness to an insured.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-17 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
2016-06-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-17 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-06 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-06-02 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-06-01 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1284 |
2016-02-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A10581 (Same As) 2016-06-07 - referred to insurance