NY S06691 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-07 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-07 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires that any limited liability company who files a rent registration statement shall include a list of all members of such limited liability company and each member's ownership interest.
Title
Requires that any limited liability company who files a rent registration statement shall include a list of all members of such limited liability company and each member's ownership interest.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-20 - Senate - Senate Housing, Construction And Community Development Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-15 - Senate - Senate Housing, Construction and Community Development Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-15 - Senate - Senate Housing, Construction and Community Development Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-07 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2024-05-22 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-05-21 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-05-20 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1240 |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2023-06-08 | Assembly | referred to housing |
2023-06-08 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-06-08 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-05-17 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2023-05-16 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2023-05-15 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.888 |
2023-05-11 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6691A |
2023-05-11 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
2023-05-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A05693 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - ordered to third reading cal.159