NY S06688 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on June 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to establishing the New York state early voting fund; establishes such fund for the purpose of making payments to the board of elections of each county and the city of New York to reimburse any actual costs incurred by such boards of elections to provide polling places for early voting.
Title
Relates to establishing the New York state early voting fund; establishes such fund for the purpose of making payments to the board of elections of each county and the city of New York to reimburse any actual costs incurred by such boards of elections to provide polling places for early voting.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | Senate | RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2017-06-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08349 (Same As) 2017-12-15 - enacting clause stricken