NY S06688 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-21 - SIGNED CHAP.185
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-21 - SIGNED CHAP.185
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to authorizing the village of Russell Gardens to file for a retroactive tax exemption.
Title
Relates to authorizing the village of Russell Gardens to file for a retroactive tax exemption.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-21 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.185 |
2016-07-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.75 |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | substituted for a9650 |
2016-03-29 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
2016-03-29 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-03-29 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-03-23 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 6688A |
2016-03-14 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-03-09 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-03-08 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.331 |
2016-02-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A09650 (Same As) 2016-06-08 - substituted by s6688a