NY S06658 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the class C felony of assault of a patient in a mental health or developmental disability facility, for the intentional causation of physical injury to a patient residing in a facility operated, licensed or certified by the office of mental health or the office for people with developmental disabilities.
Title
Establishes the class C felony of assault of a patient in a mental health or developmental disability facility, for the intentional causation of physical injury to a patient residing in a facility operated, licensed or certified by the office of mental health or the office for people with developmental disabilities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-05-22 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-05-16 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-05-15 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1283 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2017-06-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |