NY S06651 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - referred to corporations, authorities and commissions
Pending: Assembly Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the zero carbon emission investment program to be established by PSC and administered by NYSERDA; awards zero carbon emitters for avoided emissions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creates the zero carbon emission investment program to be established by PSC and administered by NYSERDA; awards zero carbon emitters for avoided emissions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-15Assemblyreferred to corporations, authorities and commissions
2017-06-15SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2017-06-15SenatePASSED SENATE
2017-06-12SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1578
2017-06-11SenatePRINT NUMBER 6651A
2017-06-11SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO RULES
2017-06-09SenateREFERRED TO RULES

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback