NY S06645 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Introduced on May 3 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-21 - PRINT NUMBER 6645B
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 3 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-21 - PRINT NUMBER 6645B
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that the thruway authority shall issue permits for ambulances and fire vehicles exempting such vehicles from paying tolls on the thruway when engaged in an emergency operation.
Title
Provides that the thruway authority shall issue permits for ambulances and fire vehicles exempting such vehicles from paying tolls on the thruway when engaged in an emergency operation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-21 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6645B |
2024-05-21 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION |
2024-04-04 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6645A |
2024-04-04 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2023-05-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A06136 (Same As) 2024-05-16 - REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS