NY S06641 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on November 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-11-21 - VETOED MEMO.519
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on November 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-11-21 - VETOED MEMO.519
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the administration of services offered by the office for people with developmental disabilities.
Title
Relates to the administration of services offered by the office for people with developmental disabilities.
Sponsors
Sen. David Carlucci [D] | Sen. Tony Avella [D] | Sen. Patrick Gallivan [R] | Sen. George Maziarz [R] |
Sen. Michael Ranzenhofer [R] | Sen. Cecilia Tkaczyk [D] | Sen. David Valesky [D] |
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-11-21 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.519 |
2014-11-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.400 |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | substituted for a8846c |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2014-06-18 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-18 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1510 |
2014-06-18 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2014-06-10 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6641C |
2014-06-10 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2014-05-22 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6641B |
2014-05-22 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2014-05-21 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2014-04-29 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6641A |
2014-04-29 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO MENTAL HEALTH AND DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES |
2014-02-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO MENTAL HEALTH AND DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES |
Same As/Similar To
A08846 (Same As) 2014-06-18 - substituted by s6641c