NY S06629 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 2 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-20 - PRINT NUMBER 6629B
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 2 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-20 - PRINT NUMBER 6629B
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to grants to cover the costs of school resource officers; authorizes boards of cooperative educational services to enter into contracts with local police entities to provide school resource officers.
Title
Relates to grants to cover the costs of school resource officers; authorizes boards of cooperative educational services to enter into contracts with local police entities to provide school resource officers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-20 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6629B |
2024-03-20 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO EDUCATION |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
2023-05-19 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6629A |
2023-05-19 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO EDUCATION |
2023-05-02 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A01526 (Same As) 2024-03-26 - print number 1526b