NY S06623 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-11 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9104
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-11 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9104
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends time limitations for certain actions arising from injury or death caused by contact with or exposure to phenoxy herbicides while serving as a member of the armed forces of the United States in Indo-China.
Title
Extends time limitations for certain actions arising from injury or death caused by contact with or exposure to phenoxy herbicides while serving as a member of the armed forces of the United States in Indo-China.
Sponsors
Sen. Greg Ball [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-04-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-11 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A9104 |
2012-06-11 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2012-06-11 | Senate | returned to senate |
2012-06-11 | Assembly | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY |
2012-04-18 | Assembly | referred to veterans' affairs |
2012-04-18 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-04-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-03-15 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2012-03-14 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2012-03-13 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.353 |
2012-03-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
Same As/Similar To
A08848 (Same As) 2012-01-04 - referred to veterans' affairs
A09104 (Same As) 2012-06-29 - signed chap.69
S07521 (Same As) 2012-05-31 - REFERRED TO CODES
A09104 (Same As) 2012-06-29 - signed chap.69
S07521 (Same As) 2012-05-31 - REFERRED TO CODES