NY S06605 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-21 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9705D
Status: Introduced on January 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-21 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9705D
Summary
Makes appropriations for the support of government - Transportation, Economic Development and Environmental Conservation Budget.
Title
Makes appropriations for the support of government - Transportation, Economic Development and Environmental Conservation Budget.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-21 | SUBSTITUTED BY A9705D | |
2010-06-21 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1062 | |
2010-06-21 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | |
2010-06-18 | PRINT NUMBER 6605C | |
2010-06-18 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE | |
2010-06-18 | PRINT NUMBER 6605B | |
2010-06-18 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE | |
2010-02-17 | PRINT NUMBER 6605A | |
2010-02-17 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE | |
2010-01-19 | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A09705 (Same As) 2010-06-22 - signed chap.55
New York State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S06605&term=2009&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y |