NY S06603 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Vetoed on December 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-29 - VETOED MEMO.85
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-29 - VETOED MEMO.85
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires Medicaid managed care plans to reimburse retail pharmacies in an amount equal to the fee-for-service rate; allows retail pharmacies the opportunity to participate in another provider's network under the medical assistance program; prohibits pharmacy benefit managers from limiting an individual's option to receive medications from non-mail order pharmacies.
Title
Requires Medicaid managed care plans to reimburse retail pharmacies in an amount equal to the fee-for-service rate; allows retail pharmacies the opportunity to participate in another provider's network under the medical assistance program; prohibits pharmacy benefit managers from limiting an individual's option to receive medications from non-mail order pharmacies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-29 | Senate | VETOED MEMO.85 |
2021-12-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.773 |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | substituted for a7598 |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2021-06-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-10 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-06-10 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1749 |
2021-06-10 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2021-05-19 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2021-05-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A07598 (Same As) 2021-06-10 - substituted by s6603