NY A07598 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-4)
Status: Introduced on May 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-10 - substituted by s6603
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-10 - substituted by s6603
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires Medicaid managed care plans to reimburse retail pharmacies in an amount equal to the fee-for-service rate; allows retail pharmacies the opportunity to participate in another provider's network under the medical assistance program; prohibits pharmacy benefit managers from limiting an individual's option to receive medications from non-mail order pharmacies.
Title
Requires Medicaid managed care plans to reimburse retail pharmacies in an amount equal to the fee-for-service rate; allows retail pharmacies the opportunity to participate in another provider's network under the medical assistance program; prohibits pharmacy benefit managers from limiting an individual's option to receive medications from non-mail order pharmacies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-10 | Assembly | substituted by s6603 |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | rules report cal.773 |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | reported |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2021-05-18 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S06603 (Same As) 2021-12-29 - VETOED MEMO.85