NY S06588 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-07 - SIGNED CHAP.225
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-07 - SIGNED CHAP.225
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes person holding the office of assistant district attorney in the county of Essex to reside in an adjoining county within the state.
Title
Authorizes person holding the office of assistant district attorney in the county of Essex to reside in an adjoining county within the state.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-07 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.225 |
2014-08-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.461 |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | substituted for a8760a |
2014-04-30 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2014-04-30 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-04-30 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-03-24 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 6588A |
2014-03-20 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2014-03-19 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2014-03-18 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.306 |
2014-02-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A08760 (Same As) 2014-06-19 - substituted by s6588a