NY S06577 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-14 - SIGNED CHAP.432
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-14 - SIGNED CHAP.432
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes business franchise and personal income tax gifts for the support of state veterans' homes; establishes the "veterans' home assistance fund" as a repository of revenue from such gifts, grants and bequests thereto; requires annual state appropriations thereto to be used for the support of the 5 state veterans' homes in the state.
Title
Establishes business franchise and personal income tax gifts for the support of state veterans' homes; establishes the "veterans' home assistance fund" as a repository of revenue from such gifts, grants and bequests thereto; requires annual state appropriations thereto to be used for the support of the 5 state veterans' homes in the state.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-14 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.432 |
2016-11-02 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2016-06-02 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-06-02 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-06-02 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.814 |
2016-06-02 | Assembly | substituted for a9315a |
2016-05-24 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2016-05-24 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-05-24 | Senate | REPASSED SENATE |
2016-05-09 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 6577A |
2016-05-09 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2016-05-09 | Senate | returned to senate |
2016-05-09 | Assembly | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY |
2016-05-04 | Assembly | referred to veterans' affairs |
2016-05-04 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-05-04 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-05-03 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-04-12 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-04-11 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.590 |
2016-03-14 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2016-01-27 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
Same As/Similar To
A09315 (Same As) 2016-06-02 - substituted by s6577a