NY S06573 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-07 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-07 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the "bridge and road investment and dedicated fund guaranteed enforcement (BRIDGE) reform act".
Title
Enacts the "bridge and road investment and dedicated fund guaranteed enforcement (BRIDGE) reform act".
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-07 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2016-06-07 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-07 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-06 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1450 |
2016-06-06 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2016-01-27 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A04376 (Same As) 2016-01-06 - referred to transportation