NY S06553 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 5 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - PRINT NUMBER 6553A
Pending: Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 5 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - PRINT NUMBER 6553A
Pending: Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes Susan Gillinder, the widow of Robert C. Ritchie, to file a new service retirement application and an option election form on behalf of her deceased husband with the New York state and local employees' retirement system.
Title
Authorizes Susan Gillinder, the widow of Robert C. Ritchie, to file a new service retirement application and an option election form on behalf of her deceased husband with the New York state and local employees' retirement system.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-05 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-17 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6553A |
2024-04-17 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2023-06-05 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
2023-06-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-06-05 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-06-05 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1582 |
2023-06-05 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2023-04-26 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A06534 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - referred to governmental employees