NY S06551 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-11-10 - SIGNED CHAP.590
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-11-10 - SIGNED CHAP.590
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Designates a portion of the state highway system in the town of Pike, county of Wyoming, as the "MSgt Thomas P. Madison Memorial Highway".
Title
Designates a portion of the state highway system in the town of Pike, county of Wyoming, as the "MSgt Thomas P. Madison Memorial Highway".
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-10 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.590 |
2022-11-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.683 |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | substituted for a6363c |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2022-06-02 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-06-02 | Senate | REPASSED SENATE |
2022-05-31 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 6551D |
2022-05-31 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2022-05-31 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-05-31 | Senate | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-17 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2022-05-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-17 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-05 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-05-04 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-05-04 | Senate | AMENDED 6551C |
2022-05-03 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1056 |
2022-04-22 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6551B |
2022-04-22 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2021-06-03 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6551A |
2021-06-03 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION |
2021-05-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A06363 (Same As) 2022-06-03 - substituted by s6551d