NY S06547 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-17 - SIGNED CHAP.445
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-17 - SIGNED CHAP.445
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to wine and liquor auctions; increases the number of auctions that can happen through the year.
Title
Relates to wine and liquor auctions; increases the number of auctions that can happen through the year.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-17 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.445 |
2012-08-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2012-06-19 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2012-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2012-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.387 |
2012-06-19 | Assembly | substituted for a9362a |
2012-06-19 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2012-06-19 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-06-19 | Senate | REPASSED SENATE |
2012-06-05 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 6547A |
2012-06-05 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2012-06-05 | Senate | returned to senate |
2012-06-05 | Assembly | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY |
2012-03-26 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
2012-03-26 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-03-26 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-03-07 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2012-03-06 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2012-03-05 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.278 |
2012-02-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A09362 (Same As) 2012-06-19 - substituted by s6547a