NY S06545 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-11 - PRINT NUMBER 6545A
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-11 - PRINT NUMBER 6545A
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Designates a portion of the state highway system as the "Specialist Peter J. Loretto, Jr. Memorial Bridge" in the town of Eden, county of Erie.
Title
Designates a portion of the state highway system as the "Specialist Peter J. Loretto, Jr. Memorial Bridge" in the town of Eden, county of Erie.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-11 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6545A |
2022-05-11 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2021-05-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A06379 (Same As) 2022-06-03 - REFERRED TO RULES