NY A06379 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-03 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-03 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Designates a portion of the state highway system as the "Specialist Peter J. Loretto, Jr. Memorial Bridge" in the town of Eden, county of Erie.
Title
Designates a portion of the state highway system as the "Specialist Peter J. Loretto, Jr. Memorial Bridge" in the town of Eden, county of Erie.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.685 |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | rules report cal.685 |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | reported |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | reference changed to ways and means |
2022-05-12 | Assembly | print number 6379b |
2022-05-12 | Assembly | amend and recommit to transportation |
2022-05-06 | Assembly | print number 6379a |
2022-05-06 | Assembly | amend and recommit to transportation |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2021-03-16 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S06545 (Same As) 2022-05-11 - PRINT NUMBER 6545A