NY S06544 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Vetoed on October 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-10-03 - VETOED MEMO.168
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Grants those assigned or employed for three continuous years as investigators and senior investigators in the bureau of criminal investigation or as a station commander, corporal, zone commander, zone sergeant, first sergeant, staff sergeant, captain or major within the division of state police protection from removal or other disciplinary action without a hearing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Grants those assigned or employed for three continuous years as investigators and senior investigators in the bureau of criminal investigation or as a station commander, corporal, zone commander, zone sergeant, first sergeant, staff sergeant, captain or major within the division of state police protection from removal or other disciplinary action without a hearing.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-05-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 133 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-10-03AssemblyVETOED MEMO.168
2012-09-21SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2012-06-06Assemblyreturned to senate
2012-06-06Assemblypassed assembly
2012-06-06Assemblyordered to third reading cal.436
2012-06-06Assemblysubstituted for a9431
2012-05-30Assemblyreferred to codes
2012-05-30SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2012-05-30SenatePASSED SENATE
2012-05-21SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2012-05-16Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2012-05-15Senate1ST REPORT CAL.806
2012-02-24SenateREFERRED TO FINANCE

Same As/Similar To

A09431 (Same As) 2012-06-06 - substituted by s6544

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback