NY S06531 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-01 - SIGNED CHAP.224
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-01 - SIGNED CHAP.224
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the effectiveness of an occupancy tax imposed in the city of Yonkers to September 1, 2024.
Title
Extends the effectiveness of an occupancy tax imposed in the city of Yonkers to September 1, 2024.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 121 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 55 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 55 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-01 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.224 |
2021-06-24 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | home rule request |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.609 |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | substituted for a7509 |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2021-06-07 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-07 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-06-03 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1501 |
2021-06-03 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2021-05-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A07509 (Same As) 2021-06-08 - substituted by s6531