NY S06530 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that altered motor vehicles commonly referred to as "stretch limousines" which were altered on or after January 1, 2020, shall have at least two safety belts for the front seat and at least one safety belt for the rear seat for each passenger for which the rear seat of such vehicle was designed.
Title
Provides that altered motor vehicles commonly referred to as "stretch limousines" which were altered on or after January 1, 2020, shall have at least two safety belts for the front seat and at least one safety belt for the rear seat for each passenger for which the rear seat of such vehicle was designed.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2019-06-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A02157 (Same As) 2020-01-21 - enacting clause stricken