NY S06508 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 26 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION
Pending: Senate Consumer Affairs and Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 26 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION
Pending: Senate Consumer Affairs and Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires online market places to provide a product recall search web form where sellers may search the United States consumer protection safety commission's recall central database to determine whether products they are selling have been recalled.
Title
Requires online market places to provide a product recall search web form where sellers may search the United States consumer protection safety commission's recall central database to determine whether products they are selling have been recalled.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-06 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2017-06-14 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6508A |
2017-06-14 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO RULES |
2017-06-06 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-05-26 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A08475 (Same As) 2018-04-20 - enacting clause stricken