NY S06505 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 26 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 26 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to supplemental military retirement allowances for members of public retirement systems of the state.
Title
Relates to supplemental military retirement allowances for members of public retirement systems of the state.
Sponsors
Sen. William Larkin [R] | Sen. Tony Avella [D] | Sen. David Carlucci [D] | Sen. Patrick Gallivan [R] |
Sen. Christopher Jacobs [R] | Sen. Luis Sepulveda [D] | Sen. David Valesky [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-05-16 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-05-15 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-05-14 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1163 |
2018-05-04 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6505B |
2018-05-04 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2018-04-03 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6505A |
2018-04-03 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2017-05-26 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A10324 (Same As) 2018-05-07 - print number 10324a