NY S06481 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-07 - SIGNED CHAP.221
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-07 - SIGNED CHAP.221
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the assessor of the county of Nassau to accept an application for exemption from real property taxes from the Living Faith Christian Church.
Title
Authorizes the assessor of the county of Nassau to accept an application for exemption from real property taxes from the Living Faith Christian Church.
Sponsors
Sen. Kemp Hannon [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 55 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 127 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 127 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-07 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.221 |
2014-08-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2014-06-17 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-06-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.352 |
2014-06-17 | Assembly | substituted for a8708 |
2014-06-10 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
2014-06-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-10 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-05-19 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2014-05-14 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2014-05-13 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.741 |
2014-01-29 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A08708 (Same As) 2014-06-17 - substituted by s6481