NY S06460 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-14 - referred to real property taxation
Pending: Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-14 - referred to real property taxation
Pending: Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to authorizing a residential redevelopment inhibited property exemption; authorizes any city, town or village to, by local law, provide for a real property tax exemption for residential redevelopment inhibited property.
Title
Relates to authorizing a residential redevelopment inhibited property exemption; authorizes any city, town or village to, by local law, provide for a real property tax exemption for residential redevelopment inhibited property.
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Ranzenhofer [R] | Sen. Fred Akshar [R] | Sen. Thomas Croci [R] | Sen. Susan Serino [R] |
Sen. James Seward [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-14 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
2016-06-14 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-14 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-03-07 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-03-02 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-03-01 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.266 |
2016-01-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A09226 (Same As) 2016-02-04 - referred to real property taxation