NY S06444 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 28 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-28 - SIGNED CHAP.261
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 28 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-28 - SIGNED CHAP.261
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the authority of the county of Nassau to impose hotel and motel taxes; extends the expiration of certain provisions relating to a surcharge on tickets to places of entertainment in such county, a charge for copying and searching for police accident reports, and receipt of service charges by the Nassau county traffic and parking violations agency; extends the authority of Nassau County to impose additional sales and compensating use taxes and local government assistance programs in Nassau County.
Title
Extends the authority of the county of Nassau to impose hotel and motel taxes; extends the expiration of certain provisions relating to a surcharge on tickets to places of entertainment in such county, a charge for copying and searching for police accident reports, and receipt of service charges by the Nassau county traffic and parking violations agency; extends the authority of Nassau County to impose additional sales and compensating use taxes and local government assistance programs in Nassau County.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 120 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 54 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-15 - Senate - Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 54 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-15 - Senate - Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-28 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.261 |
2023-07-21 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2023-05-30 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2023-05-30 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2023-05-30 | Assembly | home rule request |
2023-05-30 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.266 |
2023-05-30 | Assembly | substituted for a6589 |
2023-05-23 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2023-05-23 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-05-23 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-05-23 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2023-05-17 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2023-05-16 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2023-05-15 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.951 |
2023-04-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A06589 (Same As) 2023-05-30 - substituted by s6444