NY S06431 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-17 - referred to governmental employees
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-17 - referred to governmental employees
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Restricts use of pension assignments and which persons can engage in the business of offering consideration for pensions.
Title
Restricts use of pension assignments and which persons can engage in the business of offering consideration for pensions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - Senate - Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - Senate - Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-17 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
2018-04-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-04-17 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-03-21 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-03-20 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-03-19 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.657 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-06-13 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
2017-06-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-13 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-12 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1571 |
2017-06-12 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-06-02 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6431A |
2017-06-02 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2017-05-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A08385 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to governmental employees