NY S06427 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-08-29 - PRINT NUMBER 6427A
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-08-29 - PRINT NUMBER 6427A
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits landlords, lessors, sub-lessors and grantors from demanding broker's fees from a tenant.
Title
Prohibits landlords, lessors, sub-lessors and grantors from demanding broker's fees from a tenant.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-29 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6427A |
2022-08-29 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO JUDICIARY |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2021-04-28 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A07934 (Same As) 2022-06-03 - ordered to third reading rules cal.696