NY A07934 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on June 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-03 - ordered to third reading rules cal.696
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-03 - ordered to third reading rules cal.696
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits landlords, lessors, sub-lessors and grantors from demanding broker's fees from a tenant.
Title
Prohibits landlords, lessors, sub-lessors and grantors from demanding broker's fees from a tenant.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.696 |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | rules report cal.696 |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | reported |
2022-05-31 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-05-26 | Assembly | print number 7934a |
2022-05-26 | Assembly | amend and recommit to judiciary |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S06427 (Same As) 2022-08-29 - PRINT NUMBER 6427A