NY S06424 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-01-04 - PRINT NUMBER 6424C
Pending: Senate Social Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-01-04 - PRINT NUMBER 6424C
Pending: Senate Social Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Expands the membership of the interagency task force on trafficking in persons to include the commissioner of the department of transportation, the commissioner of the department of motor vehicles and the executive director of the New York state thruway authority.
Title
Expands the membership of the interagency task force on trafficking in persons to include the commissioner of the department of transportation, the commissioner of the department of motor vehicles and the executive director of the New York state thruway authority.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-09 - Senate - Senate Social Services Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-09 - Senate - Senate Social Services Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-04 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6424C |
2024-01-04 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO SOCIAL SERVICES |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO SOCIAL SERVICES |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2023-05-30 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2023-05-30 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-05-30 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-05-22 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 6424B |
2023-05-15 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2023-05-10 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2023-05-10 | Senate | AMENDED (T) 6424A |
2023-05-09 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.776 |
2023-04-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO SOCIAL SERVICES |
Same As/Similar To
A07133 (Same As) 2024-01-09 - print number 7133b