NY S06423 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-08 - SIGNED CHAP.28
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-08 - SIGNED CHAP.28
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to authorizing a residential redevelopment inhibited property exemption in certain cities.
Title
Relates to authorizing a residential redevelopment inhibited property exemption in certain cities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-28 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-08 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.28 |
2016-04-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2016-03-28 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-03-28 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-03-28 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.18 |
2016-03-28 | Assembly | substituted for a9195 |
2016-02-24 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2016-02-24 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-02-24 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-02-08 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 6423A |
2016-01-11 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.34 |
2016-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A09195 (Same As) 2016-03-28 - substituted by s6423a