NY S06416 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 18 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-06-07 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6750
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 18 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-06-07 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6750
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits NYC correction officers to borrow from accumulated contributions.
Title
Permits NYC correction officers to borrow from accumulated contributions.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Jackson [D] | Sen. Iwen Chu [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-07 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A6750 |
2023-06-01 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1523 |
2023-06-01 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2023-04-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A06750 (Same As) 2023-12-08 - tabled