NY S06402 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - SIGNED CHAP.52
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - SIGNED CHAP.52
Summary
Makes appropriations for the support of government - State Debt Service Budget.
Title
Makes appropriations for the support of government - State Debt Service Budget.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-28 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 105 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.52 |
2016-04-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2016-03-28 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-03-28 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-03-28 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.6 |
2016-03-28 | Assembly | substituted for a9002 |
2016-03-23 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2016-03-23 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-03-23 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-03-23 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.435 |
2016-01-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A09002 (Same As) 2016-03-28 - substituted by s6402