NY S06397 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-04 - referred to insurance
Pending: Assembly Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-04 - referred to insurance
Pending: Assembly Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for patient access to FDA approved abuse-deterrent technology to help combat opioid abuse.
Title
Provides for patient access to FDA approved abuse-deterrent technology to help combat opioid abuse.
Sponsors
Sen. David Carlucci [D] | Sen. Joseph Addabbo [D] | Sen. Anna Kaplan [D] | Sen. Jen Metzger [D] |
Sen. Kevin Parker [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-04 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
2020-02-04 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-02-04 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-01-21 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-01-15 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-01-14 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.172 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
2019-06-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-12 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-12 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1329 |
2019-06-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |