NY S06395 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO HEALTH
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO HEALTH
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the safety of dietary supplements; requires dietary supplements to bear certain labeling.
Title
Relates to the safety of dietary supplements; requires dietary supplements to bear certain labeling.
Sponsors
Sen. Kemp Hannon [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2017-05-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A07607 (Same As) 2017-12-15 - enacting clause stricken
A09897 (Same As) 2018-02-21 - referred to consumer affairs and protection
A09897 (Same As) 2018-02-21 - referred to consumer affairs and protection