NY S06375 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-15 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-15 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the New York state department of transportation, in consultation with the department of motor vehicles, the governor's traffic safety committee, local police agencies, local transportation entities in Nassau and Suffolk to conduct a study to evaluate the configuration of entrance and exit ramps, and signage at entrance ways and exits on the Southern State Parkway in Nassau and Suffolk Counties to determine whether adequate safety measures exist to prevent collisions and the instance of wrong way drivers.
Title
Requires the New York state department of transportation, in consultation with the department of motor vehicles, the governor's traffic safety committee, local police agencies, local transportation entities in Nassau and Suffolk to conduct a study to evaluate the configuration of entrance and exit ramps, and signage at entrance ways and exits on the Southern State Parkway in Nassau and Suffolk Counties to determine whether adequate safety measures exist to prevent collisions and the instance of wrong way drivers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-15 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2016-06-15 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-15 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-01 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1262 |
2016-06-01 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2016-01-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A06327 (Same As) 2016-01-06 - referred to transportation